U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00134-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Thorpe
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 04, 2020: [Order]
  • June 02, 2020: [Notice of Dismissal]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • January 17, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 18, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • December 18, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 17, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • December 16, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Search and Seizure Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 16, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • September 16, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Arraignment]
  • September 16, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • September 16, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 13, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 12, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.