U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00133-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Swarkowski
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 07, 2020: [Probation Form 12B]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: [Order Releasing Collateral]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Judgment]
  • June 29, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • June 25, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • June 23, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
March, 2020
  • March 11, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • March 11, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 10, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 10, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 09, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 02, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2020
  • February 11, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • February 11, 2020: [Pretrial Conference ]
  • February 11, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2019
  • December 13, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 13, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • December 13, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 12, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • December 05, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2019
  • November 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • November 12, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Receipt for Passport]
  • September 23, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 23, 2019: [Bond Hearing]
  • September 23, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 23, 2019: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • September 19, 2019: [Post-Hearing Memorandum]
  • September 13, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 13, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • September 13, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • September 13, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 12, 2019: [Indictment]
  • September 12, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.