U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-10400
  • Case Name: Lissa Lewis Stratton
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Operating Report]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Operating Report]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Operating Report]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Operating Report]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Case Reassigned]
  • March 02, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Case Reassigned]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Operating Report]
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Trustee's Notice of Delinquency]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Operating Report]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Operating Report]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Operating Report]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Operating Report]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Operating Report]
  • October 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Operating Report]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Operating Report]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order Confirming Plan]
  • December 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • December 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • December 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Proposed Findings and Order Confirming 13 Plan]
  • December 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Order]
  • December 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Proposed Order]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
  • November 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [341 Mtg Closed]
  • November 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • November 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing (Confirmation)]
  • November 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing Held]
  • November 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • November 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Trustee's Preliminary Report]
October, 2019
  • October 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • October 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Determine Value of Collateral]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Determine Value of Collateral]
  • September 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • September 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Notice of Confirmation Hearing]
  • September 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - 13 Plan]
  • September 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Waive Wage Withholding]
  • September 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Consent]
  • September 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Waive Wage Withholding]
  • September 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Pay Stubs/Advices with Cover Sheet]
  • September 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing (Confirmation)]
  • September 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • September 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • September 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [none]
  • September 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [none]
  • September 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • September 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • September 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • September 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.