U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00090-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bureau et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
  • November 03, 2020: [Judgment]
  • November 02, 2020: [Sentencing]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • October 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release of Funds ]
  • October 20, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
  • October 20, 2020: [Release of Funds ]
  • October 20, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
September, 2020
  • September 10, 2020: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
  • September 08, 2020: [Judgment]
  • September 04, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • September 04, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release of Funds ]
  • September 03, 2020: [Release of Funds ]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release of Funds ]
  • August 25, 2020: [Release of Funds ]
  • August 25, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
July, 2020
  • July 24, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • July 24, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 20, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 20, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 20, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 20, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 07, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2020
  • June 01, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2020
  • May 21, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • May 21, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 21, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 21, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 20, 2020: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • May 15, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 11, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2020
  • March 03, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 13, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
December, 2019
  • December 09, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
November, 2019
  • November 30, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • November 30, 2019: [Continue]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 03, 2019: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • October 02, 2019: [Appearance Bond]
  • October 02, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 02, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • October 02, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 02, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Order Scheduling a Detention Hearing]
  • September 30, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • September 30, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • September 30, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • September 30, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 30, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 30, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 30, 2019: [Detention]
  • September 30, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • September 27, 2019: [Indictment Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.