U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00139-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McAllister
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 23, 2020: [Transcript]
  • June 18, 2020: [Judgment]
  • June 17, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • June 15, 2020: [Receipt for Payment (criminal debt)]
  • June 08, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
May, 2020
  • May 21, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2020
  • March 05, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • March 04, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • March 04, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 04, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 04, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 04, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 04, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 03, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • February 12, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • February 11, 2020: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • February 11, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 04, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 08, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • October 08, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Arraignment]
  • October 08, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • October 08, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 03, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.