U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00140-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Johnson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Supplemental Index Sent USCA]
  • June 14, 2022: [USCA Form B]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 20, 2022: [Supplemental Index Sent USCA]
  • May 20, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • May 19, 2022: [Supplemental Document(s)]
  • May 19, 2022: [Transmitted Index on Appeal]
  • May 19, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 19, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 18, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 16, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • May 12, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 12, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Parties]
  • May 11, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • May 11, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • May 05, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
  • May 05, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • April 11, 2022: [Extension of Time]
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 10, 2022: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • March 09, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • March 03, 2022: [Detention]
  • March 02, 2022: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • March 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Transcript]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • November 30, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 30, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 30, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 30, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 30, 2021: [Receipt for Payment (criminal debt)]
  • November 24, 2021: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • November 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 10, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 19, 2021: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • October 18, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 08, 2021: [Transcript]
  • July 07, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • June 02, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • June 01, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • June 01, 2021: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • June 01, 2021: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
May, 2021
  • May 31, 2021: [Reply]
  • May 27, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • May 25, 2021: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • May 25, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • May 07, 2021: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • May 07, 2021: [Exceed Page Limit]
  • May 07, 2021: [Hearing]
  • May 07, 2021: [Not a motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
March, 2021
  • March 09, 2021: [Continue]
  • March 02, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 23, 2021: [Continue]
  • February 16, 2021: [Exceed Page Limit]
  • February 16, 2021: [Leave to File Document]
  • February 16, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • February 08, 2021: [Order]
  • February 04, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • February 03, 2021: [Transcript]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Teleconference Waiver]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • December 17, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • December 16, 2020: [Transcript]
  • December 10, 2020: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • December 04, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • December 03, 2020: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 03, 2020: [Exhibit List]
November, 2020
  • November 17, 2020: [Reconsideration ]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • October 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • October 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • October 16, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • October 06, 2020: [Detention]
  • October 06, 2020: [Hearing]
  • October 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
August, 2020
  • August 20, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 20, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 18, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Leave to File Document]
  • July 31, 2020: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 10, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • June 30, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 12, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (ECF Admin Only)]
  • June 09, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • June 08, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
May, 2020
  • May 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit]
  • May 08, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 01, 2020: [Leave to File Document]
  • May 01, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • May 01, 2020: [Suppress]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • April 27, 2020: [Admission Pro Hac Vice (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 17, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 16, 2020: [Detention]
  • April 15, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Removal - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • April 14, 2020: [Memorandum in Support]
  • April 14, 2020: [Release from Custody]
  • April 14, 2020: [Compassionate Release]
March, 2020
  • March 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • March 04, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • December 21, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
November, 2019
  • November 12, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • November 12, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Arraignment]
  • November 12, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • November 12, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
October, 2019
  • October 07, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 07, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 03, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.