U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00034-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Buenrostro Delgado
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 17, 2021: [Judgment]
  • March 17, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Parties]
  • March 17, 2021: [Sentencing]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 19, 2021: [Receipt for Payment (criminal debt)]
  • February 18, 2021: [Statement by Defendant re: Presentence Report]
  • February 16, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • February 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit]
  • February 16, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
  • February 12, 2021: [Exceed Page Limit]
January, 2021
  • January 11, 2021: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • January 11, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 06, 2021: [Continue]
December, 2020
  • December 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • December 24, 2020: [Extension of Time]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 24, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • September 24, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 17, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • September 17, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 17, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 14, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 09, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 04, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • September 03, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 03, 2020: [Information - Felony]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Compel]
  • August 31, 2020: [Return of Property/PreTrial]
  • August 28, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
July, 2020
  • July 20, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • July 17, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal (NEF is sent - Order is not sealed)]
  • July 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Compel ]
  • July 16, 2020: [Status Conference]
June, 2020
  • June 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
May, 2020
  • May 15, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • May 13, 2020: [Order]
  • May 13, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • May 11, 2020: [Proposed Order]
  • May 07, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 07, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Hearing (non-arraignment)]
  • May 04, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Removal - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • May 04, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 01, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
April, 2020
  • April 20, 2020: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 06, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2020
  • March 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 18, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 13, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • March 11, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Arraignment]
  • March 11, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 10, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • March 10, 2020: [Motions Referred]
  • March 10, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 06, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • March 06, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 05, 2020: [Indictment]
  • March 02, 2020: [Reply to Response to Motion]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Leave to File Document]
  • February 20, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • February 19, 2020: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 18, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 06, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • February 06, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • February 06, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 05, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • February 04, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Bill of Particulars]
  • January 21, 2020: [Compel]
  • January 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • January 13, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • November 19, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • November 18, 2019: [Order Scheduling a Detention Hearing]
  • November 18, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • November 18, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • November 18, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 18, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • November 18, 2019: [Detention]
  • November 15, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 15, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 15, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • October 18, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 16, 2019: [Indictment Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.