U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-10442
  • Case Name: Lora Brooke Johnson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Trustee Fees]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Final Decree]
  • February 19, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [6-Close Bankruptcy Case w/ Fnl Decree]
  • February 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Order of Discharge]
  • February 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [1-Discharging Debtor]
December, 2019
  • December 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
November, 2019
  • November 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Notice of Change of Address]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • October 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Pay Stubs/Advices with Cover Sheet]
  • October 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Pay Stubs/Advices with Cover Sheet]
  • October 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [none]
  • October 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [none]
  • October 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • October 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.