U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00143-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Graves
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Notice of Docket Entry Removal]
  • October 11, 2022: [Not a motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 29, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • August 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 23, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • August 12, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • August 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 03, 2022: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
  • July 12, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 12, 2022: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
October, 2021
  • October 04, 2021: [Show Cause Hearing]
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • September 15, 2021: [Hearing]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
April, 2021
  • April 13, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 12, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 09, 2021: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • April 08, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • March 31, 2021: [Continue]
  • March 23, 2021: [Continue]
  • March 23, 2021: [Release from Custody]
December, 2020
  • December 07, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 07, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
August, 2020
  • August 18, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • August 18, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 18, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 18, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 18, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 11, 2020: [Video Conference Waiver]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • January 15, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • October 23, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • October 23, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • October 23, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 23, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 23, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • October 21, 2019: [Attorney Substitution]
  • October 18, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 17, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.