U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00145-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hunter
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Judgment]
  • February 16, 2021: [Certificate of Service]
  • February 16, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • February 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to File Under Seal (NEF is sent - Order is not sealed)]
  • February 12, 2021: [File Under Seal (NEF is sent - PDF is Sealed)(COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 12, 2021: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (ECF Admin Only)]
  • February 11, 2021: [Supplemental Document(s)]
  • February 09, 2021: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • February 05, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
  • February 05, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
January, 2021
  • January 06, 2021: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • January 05, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 05, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 05, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 21, 2020: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • December 14, 2020: [Document Unsealed]
November, 2020
  • November 03, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • November 03, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 30, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
September, 2020
  • September 04, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 04, 2020: [Continue]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 20, 2020: [Continue]
July, 2020
  • July 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • July 23, 2020: [Continue]
  • July 23, 2020: [Exclude]
  • July 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 01, 2020: [Continue]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 30, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • June 30, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 29, 2020: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • June 17, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2020
  • April 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 22, 2020: [Continue]
March, 2020
  • March 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • March 09, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • March 06, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 06, 2020: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • March 02, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 26, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 25, 2020: [Proposed Order]
  • February 25, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 21, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Seizure Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 30, 2019: [Search and Seizure Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 29, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Arraignment]
  • October 28, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • October 28, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • October 28, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 24, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 17, 2019: [Indictment]
  • October 16, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 16, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 16, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • October 16, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 16, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.