U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00102-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Richards
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 21, 2020: [Dismiss]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • October 28, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 28, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • October 28, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • October 28, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • October 25, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 25, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • October 25, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • October 24, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 22, 2019: [Indictment Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.