U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:09-cr-00109-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Harper
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 08, 2020: [Probation Form 12]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 21, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 21, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 20, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 20, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 15, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 14, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • November 05, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 04, 2019: [Probation Form 12]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.