U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:13-cr-00001-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sheldrick et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 14, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 14, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 08, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Hearing (non-arraignment)]
  • April 07, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2020
  • March 06, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 06, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 06, 2020: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • March 06, 2020: [Motions Referred]
  • March 06, 2020: [Revocation of Release]
  • March 06, 2020: [Document Unsealed]
February, 2020
  • February 06, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 04, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 04, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • February 04, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 23, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 22, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 14, 2020: [Probation Form 12]
November, 2019
  • November 05, 2019: [Attorney Substitution]
  • November 05, 2019: [Probation Form 12B]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.