U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-10467
  • Case Name: Benjamin J. Wisehart and Alexandra C. Wisehart
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Trustee Fees]
April, 2020
  • April 12, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [BNC - Final Decree]
  • April 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [6-Close Bankruptcy Case w/ Fnl Decree]
  • April 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
February, 2020
  • February 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [BNC - Order of Discharge]
  • February 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [1-Discharging Debtor]
January, 2020
  • January 07, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Paperless)]
December, 2019
  • December 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • December 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [341 Mtg Closed]
November, 2019
  • November 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [BNC - Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Creditor Request for Notices (Paperless)]
  • November 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [none]
  • November 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [none]
  • November 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • November 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Pay Stubs/Advices with Cover Sheet]
  • November 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • November 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Pay Stubs/Advices with Cover Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.