open-public-records

U.S. District Court for the District of Vermont

VERMONT PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont
    Case Number:2:19-cr-00153-1
    Party Name:USA v. Watts et al
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:May 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:April 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:April 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:April 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Plea Entered]
    Date Published:April 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Hearing (non-arraignment)]
    Date Published:April 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Information - Felony]
    Date Published:March 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:March 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Proposed Order]
    Date Published:February 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motions Referred]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revocation of Release]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:November 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:November 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:November 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:November 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Search and Seizure Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:November 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
    Date Published:November 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Order of Detention]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:[~Util - Ruling on Motions]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Attorney Substitution]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Order Scheduling a Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:[~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Document Unsealed]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion to Unseal Document ]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Notice of Docket Entry Removal - (ECF Admin Only)]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Unseal Document (Court use only)]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Not a motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Detention]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:[CJA 20 - Appointment]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Complaint]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.vtd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?31037
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =