open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Vermont

VERMONT PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Vermont
    Case Number:19-10475
    Party Name:Christle D. Brooks and Barry O. Brooks
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Letter]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Pay Stubs/Advices with Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Notice of Deficiency]
    Date Published:November 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Deficiencies (7)]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:November 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Creditor Request for Notices (Paperless)]
    Date Published:November 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [none]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) - case upload]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.vtb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?40803
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =