open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Vermont

VERMONT PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Vermont
    Case Number:19-10473
    Party Name:Terry Melissa Wing
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing (Document)]
    Date Published:March 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order Confirming Plan]
    Date Published:January 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Court Notice]
    Date Published:January 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice (Generic)]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Mortgage Mediation (Order)]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Proposed Findings and Order Confirming 13 Plan]
    Date Published:January 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:January 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
    Date Published:January 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [341 Mtg Closed]
    Date Published:December 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:December 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Mortgage Mediation]
    Date Published:December 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:December 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Trustee's Preliminary Report]
    Date Published:December 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
    Date Published:November 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Paperless)]
    Date Published:November 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Consent]
    Date Published:November 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Waive Wage Withholding]
    Date Published:November 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Notice of Deficiency]
    Date Published:November 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Deficiencies (13)]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Notice of Confirmation Hearing]
    Date Published:November 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:November 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - 13 Plan]
    Date Published:November 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Creditor Request for Notices (Paperless)]
    Date Published:November 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Pay Stubs/Advices with Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing (Confirmation)]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [none]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.vtb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?40801
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =