U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00151-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MacDonald
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • September 06, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2021
  • August 03, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Continue]
June, 2020
  • June 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 12, 2020: [Continue]
April, 2020
  • April 10, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • April 10, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2020
  • March 12, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 12, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 12, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 12, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 12, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 09, 2020: [Order]
  • March 09, 2020: [Proposed Order]
  • March 02, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 02, 2020: [Pretrial Conference ]
  • March 02, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 15, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • December 17, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 17, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 09, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • December 05, 2019: [Not a motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 05, 2019: [Order]
  • December 05, 2019: [Motions Referred]
  • December 05, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • November 14, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • November 14, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • November 14, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • November 14, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 14, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • November 14, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • November 14, 2019: [Detention]
  • November 14, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.