U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00152-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Laplante
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [Probation Form 35]
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [Receipt for Payment (criminal debt)]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Judgment]
  • October 26, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Parties]
  • October 23, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • October 20, 2020: [Supplemental Sentencing Memorandum]
  • October 13, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • October 08, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
July, 2020
  • July 02, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • July 02, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2020
  • June 26, 2020: [Teleconference Waiver]
  • June 26, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 26, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 26, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 26, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 26, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 24, 2020: [Release from Custody]
  • June 10, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2020
  • April 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • April 15, 2020: [Exclude]
February, 2020
  • February 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • February 14, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
December, 2019
  • December 10, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 10, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • December 09, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • December 09, 2019: [Document Unsealed]
  • December 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to File Under Seal (NEF is sent - Order is not sealed)]
  • December 06, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 06, 2019: [Motions Referred]
  • December 06, 2019: [Reconsideration, Review, or to Vacate Order of Detention]
  • December 06, 2019: [File Under Seal (NEF is sent - PDF is Sealed)(COURT USE ONLY)]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 15, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • November 15, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • November 15, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • November 14, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.