U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00153-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Watts et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 12, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 09, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Status Conference]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order of Prosecutorial Obligation Under Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f)]
  • August 30, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • August 12, 2022: [Probation Form 12]
  • August 10, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 21, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • July 15, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 08, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 06, 2022: [Probation Form 12]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 22, 2022: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • December 27, 2021: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • December 16, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [Judgment]
  • December 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 28, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2020
  • October 16, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 16, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 16, 2020: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • October 06, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • October 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Revocation of Release]
  • October 06, 2020: [Revocation of Release]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 30, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • June 29, 2020: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • June 29, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 29, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • June 24, 2020: [Teleconference Waiver]
  • June 24, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
  • June 24, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • June 19, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
May, 2020
  • May 05, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • May 05, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2020
  • April 02, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 02, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 02, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 02, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 02, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 02, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 01, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Hearing (non-arraignment)]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 30, 2020: [Information - Felony]
  • March 24, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 11, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 10, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • February 25, 2020: [Proposed Order]
  • February 24, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 20, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • February 20, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 20, 2020: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • February 20, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • February 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • February 20, 2020: [Motions Referred]
  • February 20, 2020: [Revocation of Release]
  • February 19, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 21, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • November 21, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • November 21, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • November 20, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 18, 2019: [Search and Seizure Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 14, 2019: [Indictment]
  • November 14, 2019: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.