U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00154-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Devoid
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • January 19, 2023: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 09, 2023: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 03, 2023: [Summons Returned Executed]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 20, 2022: [Probation Form 12]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Judgment]
  • March 26, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Parties]
  • March 26, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 26, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • March 23, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
  • March 22, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Teleconference Waiver]
  • January 21, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 21, 2021: [Document Unsealed]
  • January 20, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • January 05, 2021: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • January 05, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 24, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • November 18, 2020: [Show Cause]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
September, 2020
  • September 18, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • September 17, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Removal - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • September 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause ]
  • September 17, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 16, 2020: [Show Cause]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 27, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 27, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines]
  • July 20, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 02, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • April 29, 2020: [Exclude]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • February 21, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • November 27, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Arraignment]
  • November 27, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • November 27, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • November 20, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 14, 2019: [Indictment]
  • November 14, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 14, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 14, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 14, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 14, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.