U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00157-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Martin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • January 24, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 21, 2022: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • December 20, 2022: [Extension of Time]
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 02, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 23, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Acquittal]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for New Trial]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Acquittal]
  • July 11, 2022: [New Trial]
  • July 11, 2022: [Set Aside Judgment]
  • July 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 05, 2022: [Extension of Time re Transcript]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • June 14, 2022: [Jury Notes (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • June 13, 2022: [Jury Verdict]
  • June 13, 2022: [Jury Charge]
  • June 10, 2022: [Notice of Docket Entry Removal - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • June 10, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 06, 2022: [Jury Seating Arrangement (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • June 06, 2022: [Jury Selection]
  • June 06, 2022: [Jury Trial]
  • June 06, 2022: [In Chambers Conference]
  • June 03, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • June 03, 2022: [In Limine]
  • June 02, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • May 30, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • May 26, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 26, 2022: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • May 26, 2022: [Transcript]
  • May 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • May 25, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 18, 2022: [In Limine]
  • May 12, 2022: [In Limine]
  • May 06, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • May 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 05, 2022: [Judgment]
  • April 04, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • April 04, 2022: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • April 04, 2022: [Supplemental Document(s)]
  • April 04, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • March 30, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 11, 2022: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 20, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 06, 2022: [In Limine]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 22, 2021: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • December 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 20, 2021: [Continue]
  • December 17, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 17, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 10, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • December 07, 2021: [Continue]
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Exclude]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 20, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 20, 2021: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • September 20, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 20, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 20, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 13, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • June 25, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 14, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • June 14, 2021: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • June 10, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
May, 2021
  • May 17, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 03, 2021: [Compel]
April, 2021
  • April 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • April 17, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • April 08, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • February 17, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • January 19, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
December, 2020
  • December 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • December 07, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • December 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 01, 2020: [Response in Support of Motion]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 16, 2020: [Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 22, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 22, 2020: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • October 22, 2020: [Teleconference Waiver]
  • October 22, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • October 22, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 22, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 22, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • October 22, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 21, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 21, 2020: [Indictment Unsealed]
  • October 20, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • October 20, 2020: [Pretrial Conference ]
  • October 20, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 20, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 16, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Arraignment]
  • October 15, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 15, 2020: [Indictment - Redacted]
September, 2020
  • September 18, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
June, 2020
  • June 11, 2020: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • June 09, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • June 08, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 08, 2020: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • June 05, 2020: [Supplemental Document(s)]
May, 2020
  • May 22, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • May 11, 2020: [Reconsideration, Review, or to Vacate Order of Detention]
  • May 11, 2020: [Withdrawal of Motion]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Hearing (non-arraignment)]
  • April 24, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 22, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 21, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 21, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 21, 2020: [Not a motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 21, 2020: [Withdraw Document]
  • April 13, 2020: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • April 09, 2020: [Disclosure]
  • April 09, 2020: [Order]
  • April 07, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • April 07, 2020: [Motions Referred]
  • April 07, 2020: [Reconsideration, Review, or to Vacate Order of Detention]
  • April 07, 2020: [Release from Custody]
  • April 06, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 06, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 06, 2020: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • April 06, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 18, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 18, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 18, 2020: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • February 06, 2020: [Reconsideration, Review, or to Vacate Order of Detention]
  • February 06, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • February 06, 2020: [Continue]
  • February 06, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • December 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 10, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • November 26, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • November 26, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Arraignment]
  • November 26, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • November 26, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • November 26, 2019: [Notice of Docket Entry Removal - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • November 26, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 22, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 21, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.