U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00156-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rollins
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 05, 2021: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
January, 2021
  • January 11, 2021: [Receipt for Payment (criminal debt)]
November, 2020
  • November 04, 2020: [Judgment]
  • November 04, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • November 04, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
July, 2020
  • July 17, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • July 17, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 08, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 08, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 08, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • July 07, 2020: [Notice of Appearance - USA]
  • July 07, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 07, 2020: [Video Conference Waiver]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Memorandum in Support]
  • May 15, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 15, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 15, 2020: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • May 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • May 06, 2020: [Admission Pro Hac Vice (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 02, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Dismiss]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • February 20, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
December, 2019
  • December 06, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • November 27, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 27, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • November 25, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 22, 2019: [Order Scheduling a Detention Hearing]
  • November 22, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • November 22, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • November 22, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 22, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • November 22, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 22, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 22, 2019: [Detention]
  • November 22, 2019: [Indictment Unsealed]
  • November 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document (Sealed - No NEF)]
  • November 21, 2019: [Seal Document (Sealed - No NEF)(COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 21, 2019: [Indictment (Sealed - No NEF)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.