U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00142-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Caraballo et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Detention]
  • January 21, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 21, 2020: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • January 15, 2020: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • January 13, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 10, 2020: [Document Unsealed]
  • January 10, 2020: [Indictment Unsealed]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • December 20, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 20, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • December 20, 2019: [Bond Hearing]
  • December 20, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 18, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 13, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 03, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 03, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • December 03, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Indictment - Redacted]
  • November 26, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.