U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00160-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cruz et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
April, 2021
  • April 14, 2021: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Judgment]
  • March 30, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • March 30, 2021: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • March 26, 2021: [Supplemental Document(s)]
  • March 22, 2021: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • March 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to File Under Seal (NEF is sent - Order is not sealed)]
  • March 22, 2021: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (ECF Admin Only)]
  • March 22, 2021: [File Under Seal (NEF is sent - PDF is Sealed)(COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 19, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
  • March 19, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
December, 2020
  • December 10, 2020: [Receipt for Payment (criminal debt)]
  • December 08, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • December 08, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 08, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 08, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 08, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 08, 2020: [Video Conference Waiver]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 23, 2020: [Proposed Order]
  • October 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 22, 2020: [Continue]
  • October 19, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2020
  • September 09, 2020: [Judgment]
  • September 04, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • September 04, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
  • August 21, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • August 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 20, 2020: [Continue]
  • August 17, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2020
  • July 24, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • July 23, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2020
  • June 23, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 18, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • June 18, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 17, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 17, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 17, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 16, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 11, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 05, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • May 14, 2020: [Hearing]
  • May 04, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 24, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 16, 2020: [Supplemental Document(s)]
  • April 15, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • April 15, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 14, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Hearing (non-arraignment)]
  • April 14, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 13, 2020: [Reconsideration, Review, or to Vacate Order of Detention]
  • April 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 10, 2020: [Continue]
  • April 10, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 09, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Hearing (non-arraignment)]
  • April 09, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 08, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Hearing (non-arraignment)]
  • April 08, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 08, 2020: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • April 03, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 02, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Order]
  • March 31, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • March 30, 2020: [Release from Custody]
  • March 26, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 24, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 17, 2020: [Memorandum in Support]
  • March 16, 2020: [Supplemental Document(s)]
  • March 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • March 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • March 02, 2020: [Leave to File Document]
  • March 02, 2020: [Extension of Time]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • February 24, 2020: [Order]
  • February 24, 2020: [Notice of Dismissal]
  • February 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 05, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • February 05, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • February 05, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 04, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • February 04, 2020: [Suppress]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • January 27, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 24, 2020: [Suppress]
December, 2019
  • December 13, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Arraignment]
  • December 13, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • December 09, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • December 09, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • December 09, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 05, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.