U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cr-00006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Carroll
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
March, 2021
  • March 05, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • February 10, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2020
  • September 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 04, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2020
  • August 05, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 05, 2020: [Continue]
May, 2020
  • May 05, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • May 05, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 05, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 05, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 05, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines]
  • May 05, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • April 22, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 20, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • March 17, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
February, 2020
  • February 03, 2020: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2020
  • January 17, 2020: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • January 17, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • January 17, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • January 17, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 17, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 17, 2020: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • January 16, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.