open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Vermont

VERMONT PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Vermont
    Case Number:20-10019
    Party Name:Sara T. Rice
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Trustee's Preliminary Report]
    Date Published:February 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
    Date Published:February 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Pay Ch 13 Tr Wages Pursuant to Wage Withholding Authorization]
    Date Published:January 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Wage Withholding/Automatic Debits from Bank Account Authorization]
    Date Published:January 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:January 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Notice of Deficiency]
    Date Published:January 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Notice of Confirmation Hearing]
    Date Published:January 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - 13 Plan]
    Date Published:January 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Deficiencies (13)]
    Date Published:January 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing (Confirmation)]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [none]
    Date Published:January 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:January 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:January 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Pay Stubs/Advices with Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:January 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:January 20, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.vtb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?40905
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =