U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cr-00011-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Practice Fusion, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Deferral of Prosecution ]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 27, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2020
  • March 19, 2020: [Search and Seizure Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 10, 2020: [Application for Search Warrant]
February, 2020
  • February 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • February 13, 2020: [Admission Pro Hac Vice (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 07, 2020: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • January 27, 2020: [Exclude]
  • January 27, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • January 27, 2020: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.