U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-00031-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Martinez-Cordova
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 10, 2020: [Judgment]
  • March 10, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Parties]
  • March 09, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 09, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • March 09, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 09, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • March 09, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 05, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • March 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 02, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 02, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 25, 2020: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.