U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-00038-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Riley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • May 26, 2022: [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
June, 2021
  • June 01, 2021: [Receipt for Payment (criminal debt)]
December, 2020
  • December 16, 2020: [Judgment]
  • December 16, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Parties]
  • December 16, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • December 16, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 09, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • December 02, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • December 02, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2020
  • November 13, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • November 12, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2020
  • July 20, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • July 20, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 17, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 17, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 17, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 17, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines]
June, 2020
  • June 19, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 15, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2020
  • March 17, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 17, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 17, 2020: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • March 12, 2020: [Order Scheduling a Detention Hearing]
  • March 12, 2020: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • March 12, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • March 12, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • March 12, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 12, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 12, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • March 12, 2020: [Detention]
  • March 12, 2020: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 12, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.