open-public-records

U.S. District Court for the District of Vermont

VERMONT PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. District Court for the District of Vermont
    Case Number:2:20-mj-00064-1
    Party Name:USA v. Blohm
  • Filing Type:[Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:May 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:[Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
    Date Published:May 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:[Reconsideration, Review, or to Vacate Order of Detention]
    Date Published:May 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:[Order of Detention]
    Date Published:May 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:[Waiver of Personal Appearance at Hearing (non-arraignment)]
    Date Published:May 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:[Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:May 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:[~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:May 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:[~Util - Ruling on Motions]
    Date Published:May 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:[Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:May 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:[Detention]
    Date Published:May 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion to Seal Document (Sealed - No NEF)]
    Date Published:May 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:[Seal Document (Sealed - No NEF)(COURT USE ONLY)]
    Date Published:May 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:[Complaint]
    Date Published:May 22, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.vtd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?31575
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =