open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Vermont

VERMONT PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Vermont
    Case Number:20-10212
    Party Name:Corporation of Southern Vermont College, Inc.
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [BNC - Order]
    Date Published:July 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:July 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Order to Set Hearing]
    Date Published:July 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:July 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Consent]
    Date Published:July 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Proposed Order]
    Date Published:July 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Supplement]
    Date Published:July 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:July 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Employ (Application)]
    Date Published:July 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [BNC - Notice to File Claims]
    Date Published:July 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [BNC - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:July 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Notice to File Claims]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Appear pro hac vice]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Notice of Assets (no image needed)]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Paperless)]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Exhibit]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [none]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) - case upload]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.vtb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?41104
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =