U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cr-00007-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McNair
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Transcript]
June, 2021
  • June 04, 2021: [Judgment]
  • June 03, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • June 01, 2021: [Video Conference Waiver]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
  • May 27, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • April 29, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2021
  • January 11, 2021: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • December 23, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 23, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 23, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 23, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 23, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 23, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 23, 2020: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • December 02, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2020
  • November 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
August, 2020
  • August 12, 2020: [Order Reassigning Case]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 28, 2020: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • July 28, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • July 28, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • July 28, 2020: [Teleconference Waiver]
  • July 28, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • July 28, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 28, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 28, 2020: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • July 27, 2020: [Detention]
  • July 27, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 27, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 27, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 27, 2020: [Indictment Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.