open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Vermont

VERMONT PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Vermont
    Case Number:20-10240
    Party Name:Dale E. Lyman and Annette K Lyman
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Notice of No Action by Court]
    Date Published:August 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Order]
    Date Published:August 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Consent]
    Date Published:August 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice of No Action by Court]
    Date Published:August 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Repeat Filings]
    Date Published:August 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Notice of Confirmation Hearing]
    Date Published:August 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - 13 Plan]
    Date Published:August 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Creditor Request for Notices (Paperless)]
    Date Published:August 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Proposed Order]
    Date Published:July 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing (Confirmation)]
    Date Published:July 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:July 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Waive Wage Withholding]
    Date Published:July 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:July 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Pay Stubs/Advices with Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:July 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [none]
    Date Published:July 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:July 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:July 31, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.vtb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?41135
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =