U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:11-cr-00099-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Anderson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 16, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • December 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 24, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 07, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 04, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 04, 2022: [Probation Form 12]
January, 2021
  • January 14, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 04, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 05, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 05, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • October 05, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 30, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 23, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 23, 2020: [Probation Form 12]
  • September 23, 2020: [Attorney Substitution]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.