open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Vermont

VERMONT PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Vermont
    Case Number:20-10322
    Party Name:Aden E. Schillinger and Melissa M. Schillinger
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [BNC - Meeting of Creditors (Telephonic)]
    Date Published:October 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [341 Mtg (Telephonic)]
    Date Published:October 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Creditor Request for Notices]
    Date Published:October 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [BNC - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:October 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Creditor Request for Notices (Paperless)]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:October 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Pay Stubs/Advices with Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:October 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Pay Stubs/Advices with Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:October 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [none]
    Date Published:October 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [none]
    Date Published:October 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:October 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:October 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:October 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:October 16, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.vtb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?41219
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =