U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cr-00035-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Babatunde
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 26, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 28, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • November 28, 2022: [Supplemental Sentencing Memorandum]
  • November 22, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • November 16, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • August 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 15, 2022: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • August 15, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • August 15, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 15, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 08, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 04, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [Request for Writ]
  • June 09, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2021
  • March 01, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 01, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
November, 2020
  • November 03, 2020: [Indictment Unsealed]
  • November 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.