U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cr-00109-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LaPlaca
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2024
  • December 27, 2024: [Sentencing Memorandum]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF)]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 29, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • September 19, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • September 15, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • August 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 01, 2022: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • March 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • February 09, 2022: [Memorandum re: Revocation of Supervised Release]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Continue]
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • October 05, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 01, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 01, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 01, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 01, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Reconsideration, Review, or to Vacate Order of Detention]
  • September 30, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 30, 2021: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • September 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
August, 2021
  • August 13, 2021: [Continue]
July, 2021
  • July 08, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • July 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 08, 2021: [Continue]
June, 2021
  • June 01, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • May 11, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • May 11, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • April 23, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • April 14, 2021: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • April 13, 2021: [Suppress]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • January 29, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 26, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • January 20, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 06, 2021: [Motions Referred]
  • January 06, 2021: [Reconsideration, Review, or to Vacate Order of Detention]
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 22, 2020: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • December 22, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • December 21, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 21, 2020: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • December 17, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • December 17, 2020: [Order Scheduling a Detention Hearing]
  • December 17, 2020: [Order of Prosecutorial Obligation Under Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f)]
  • December 17, 2020: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • December 17, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 17, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 17, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • December 16, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 16, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • December 15, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 15, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 15, 2020: [Detention]
  • December 15, 2020: [Indictment Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.