U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:12-cr-00108-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hemingway
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 06, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 06, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 04, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Video Conference Waiver]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • June 25, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 21, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 14, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • June 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 04, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • May 24, 2021: [Exclude]
  • May 06, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2021
  • April 12, 2021: [Probation Form 12]
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 08, 2021: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • March 08, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • March 05, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 05, 2021: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • March 05, 2021: [Order]
  • March 05, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2021
  • February 08, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 19, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 15, 2021: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • January 15, 2021: [Attorney Substitution]
  • January 15, 2021: [Probation Form 12]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.