U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:12-cr-00059-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lester
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 08, 2022: [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 23, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • May 12, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 11, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 10, 2022: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • May 09, 2022: [Supplemental Document(s)]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [Order of Prosecutorial Obligation Under Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f)]
  • November 09, 2021: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • November 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 08, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • November 04, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 27, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • October 19, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 18, 2021: [Probation Form 12]
  • October 18, 2021: [Attorney Substitution]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.