U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00093-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Renner
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Reentry Drug Court Proceedings]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF)]
  • November 04, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 04, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • November 03, 2022: [Supplemental Sentencing Memorandum]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • October 28, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • July 06, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • March 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 28, 2022: [Order of Prosecutorial Obligation Under Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f)]
  • March 28, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 28, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 25, 2022: [Information - Felony]
  • March 03, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Attorney Substitution]
  • January 24, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 21, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • December 17, 2021: [Motions Referred]
  • December 16, 2021: [Reconsideration, Review, or to Vacate Order of Detention]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • October 26, 2021: [Order of Prosecutorial Obligation Under Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f)]
  • October 26, 2021: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • October 26, 2021: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • October 26, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • October 26, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 26, 2021: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • October 26, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 22, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • October 21, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.