U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00138-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Poczobut
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF)]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 14, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • April 04, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Order Reassigning Case]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • December 28, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order Temporarily Reassigning Case]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Search and Seizure Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 28, 2022: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • November 28, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • November 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • November 18, 2022: [Application for Search Warrant]
  • November 17, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.