U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-00080
  • Case Name: Golrick et al v. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 03, 2025: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 30, 2025: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 30, 2025: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Transmitted Index on Appeal]
February, 2025
  • February 28, 2025: [Notice of Appeal]
October, 2024
  • October 13, 2024: [Leave to File Document]
  • October 08, 2024: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 04, 2024: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.