U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00056-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Sau et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration of Detention]
  • April 25, 2025: [Reconsideration, Review, or to Vacate Order of Detention]
  • April 17, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 17, 2025: [Proposed Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 16, 2025: [Telephone Conference]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 15, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Transmitted Index on Appeal]
  • March 18, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • March 13, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [Withdraw Document]
December, 2024
  • December 04, 2024: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF)]
October, 2024
  • October 31, 2024: [Document Unsealed]
  • October 11, 2024: [In Limine]
  • October 10, 2024: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • October 08, 2024: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 07, 2024: [Trial Memorandum]
  • October 07, 2024: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order]
  • October 07, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 07, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.