U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 23, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 22, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 22, 2025: [Information - Felony]
December, 2024
  • December 08, 2024: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • October 08, 2024: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • October 07, 2024: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.