U.S. District Court for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-mj-00097-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McKinnie
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 14, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 11, 2025: [Request for Writ]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Search and Seizure Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 18, 2025: [Application for Search Warrant]
  • March 14, 2025: [Complaint]
  • March 14, 2025: [Application for Search Warrant by Electronic Means]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.