U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00043-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Khan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • April 14, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 14, 2025: [Receipt for Payment (criminal debt)]
  • April 04, 2025: [Supplemental Document(s)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Letter]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
  • March 28, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.