U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10074
  • Case Name: Robert Lafayette
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli, Andrea E [Hearing Held]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli, Andrea E [Certificate of Service]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli, Andrea E [Declaration About Individual Debtors Schedules]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli, Andrea E [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli, Andrea E [Schedule C]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli, Andrea E [Supplement]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli, Andrea E [BNC - Notice of Show Cause Hearing]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli, Andrea E [Hearing (Show Cause)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli, Andrea E [Appear Remotely]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli, Andrea E [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli, Andrea E [Response]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli, Andrea E [Payment of Chapter 13 Installment Fee]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli, Andrea E [Objection]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli, Andrea E [BNC - Order]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli, Andrea E [BNC - Notice of Deficiency]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli, Andrea E [BNC - Notice of Confirmation Hearing]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli, Andrea E [BNC - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli, Andrea E [BNC - 13 Plan]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli, Andrea E [Repeat Filings]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli, Andrea E [Pay Ch 13 Tr Wages Pursuant to Wage Withholding Authorization]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli, Andrea E [Hearing (Document)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli, Andrea E [Deficiencies (13)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli, Andrea E [Hearing (Confirmation)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli, Andrea E [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli, Andrea E [Impose/Extend Automatic Stay]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli, Andrea E [Pay Filing Fees in Installments (Application)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli, Andrea E [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Application)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli, Andrea E [Wage Withholding/ACH/TFS Authorization]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli, Andrea E [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli, Andrea E [Pay Stubs/Advices with Cover Sheet]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli, Andrea E [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli, Andrea E [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.