U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00389
  • Case Name: Mahdawi v. Trump et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 30, 2025: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF)]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal (NEF is sent - Order is not sealed)]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction]
  • April 29, 2025: [File Under Seal (NEF is sent - Entry and PDF visible)]
  • April 29, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 29, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 28, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF)]
  • April 28, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 25, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 25, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 25, 2025: [Expedite]
  • April 24, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal (NEF is sent - Order is not sealed)]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • April 22, 2025: [Memorandum]
  • April 22, 2025: [File Under Seal (NEF is sent - Entry and PDF visible)]
  • April 22, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF)]
  • April 21, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 21, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF)]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 15, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 14, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • April 14, 2025: [Filing Fee Received]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF)]
  • April 14, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 14, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.