open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Washington

WASHINGTON PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Washington
    Case Number:4:19-cv-05223
    Party Name:Gardner v. Jacobson et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment - Clerk]
    Date Published:January 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:January 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Waive Collection of Filing Fee under PLRA - Prisoner Cases Only]
    Date Published:December 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Voluntary Dismissal - Prisoner Cases Only]
    Date Published:December 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:November 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Amend or File Voluntary Dismissal]
    Date Published:November 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order IFP Calculate]
    Date Published:November 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:October 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:October 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter to Prisoner from Clerk - Case Opening]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.waed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?87595
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =